Financial history COQUET TRUST

Charity number: 1121062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.95m £6.54m £7.35m £8.12m £8.98m
Total expenditure £5.72m £6.50m £7.26m £7.79m £9.11m
Income from government contracts £5.94m £6.45m £7.01m £8.05m £8.89m
Income from government grants N/A £91.93k £320.97k £65.94k £52.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £91.93k £323.29k £65.94k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £2.15k £14.48k £1.36k £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.94m £6.45m £7.01m £8.05m £8.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.35k £2.38k £355 £5.52k £23.95k
Income - Other £1.14k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.72m £6.50m £7.26m £7.79m £9.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £8.13k £20.29k £12.65k £13.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £11.17k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0