THE AFRICAN CONSERVATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
African Conservation Foundation (ACF) is working to preserve Africa 's wild heritage by conducting field projects as well as supporting and linking conservation initiatives throughout the continent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Algeria
- Angola
- Benin
- Botswana
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- Egypt
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Réunion
- Rwanda
- Saint Helena
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 29 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Varney | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Roberts | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louis Nkembi | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bault | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Tambwe Musimbi | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David James Fox | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERESA HARNWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DRS Arend de Haas | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ELLIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.01k | £13.56k | £36.85k | £10.15k | £22.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.97k | £11.01k | £36.02k | £16.50k | £19.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 2001.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND RESTORATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE NATURAL RESOURCES AND BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY INCLUDING ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE IN AFRICA AND TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE ABOUT CONSERVATION IN AFRICA THROUGH: 3.1 PROMOTING, LINKING AND SUPPORTING CONSERVATION INITIATIVES THROUGHOUT AFRICA; 3.2 PROVIDING TRAINING, SUPPORT AND TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE TO CONSERVATION INITIATIVES, IN PARTICULAR GRASSROOTS PROJECTS, IN AFRICA; 3.3 OFFERING CAPACITY SUPPORT FOR SUSTAINABLE COMMUNITY PROJECTS LINKED WITH CONSERVATION; 3.4 SERVING AS AN EDUCATIONAL RESOURCE CENTRE IN AFRICA AND THE WORLD; 3.5 CONDUCTING ON-THE-GROUND RESEARCH AND CONSERVATION PROJECTS.
Area of benefit
AFRICA AND THE WORLD. IN PRACTICE: AFRICA AND THEN WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AFRICAN CONSERVATION FOUNDATION
6 Clifton Road
LONDON
N22 7XN
- Phone:
- 003128515040
- Email:
- info@africanconservation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window