THE LACEY THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1122069
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity is a Theatre Company which creates and delivers new works for the general public and schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2010

Total income: £48,261
Total expenditure: £53,769

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 December 2007: Standard registration
  • 08 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2009 31/05/2010
Total gross income £60.42k £48.26k
Total expenditure £71.76k £53.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2010 03 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2010 02 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2009 24 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 24 February 2010 On Time