Trustees Northants Community Aid

Charity number: 1120895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samuel Sayer Chair 02 March 2022
None on record
Martin Steven Crooke Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Catherine Armstrong Trustee 12 March 2023
None on record
Tracy Whittaker-Smith Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Paul Green Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Kathryn Julie Ozlati Trustee 20 April 2015
None on record