FRIENDS OF CHEVRON YESHIVA GIVAAT MORDECHAI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advance orthodox jewish faith and orthodox jewish religious education and in particular supporting the college Chevron Yeshiva Givaat Mordechai
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 25 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMUEL WEINROT | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Menachem Mendel Friedman | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
NEHEMIA SHEINFELD | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOEL ADLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.99k | £55.34k | £87.70k | £29.64k | £45.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £750 | £293.60k | £600 | £600 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH AND ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE COLLEGE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 ALBA GARDENS
LONDON
NW11 9NS
- Phone:
- 02082090678
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window