Financial history PIMLOTT FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1122550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £5.48k £3.71k £8.04k £10.27k £7.23k
Total expenditure £9.32k £4.86k £10.33k £11.05k £7.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A