THE ODYSSEY CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote sustainable development for the benefit of the public in particular, but not exclusively, in the Maluane conservation areas of Mozambique
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Mozambique
Governance
- 15 August 2007: Standard registration
- THE MALUANE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE ODYSSEY CONSERVATIONTRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugo Montgomery | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|||||
LORD EDWARD JOHN FRANCIS MANNERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER PETER COX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £575 | £554 | £0 | £47.86k | £2.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £495 | £928 | £37.77k | £37.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2023
(These accounts |
31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 June 2023 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/08/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/05/2012 as amended on 17 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
I) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE MALUANE CONSERVATION AREAS, MOZAMBIQUE, BY: A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; B) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. 'SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT' MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS". II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL BUILDINGS, SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES. III) THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OS CLINICS, SUPPORT AND SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HADDON HALL
BAKEWELL
DE45 1LA
- Phone:
- 01629812855
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
odysseyconservationtrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window