ODESSA CHILDRENS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for the orphanages in Odessa, whether through suppying clothing, medication, beds & linen and washing facilities
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ukraine
Governance
- 16 October 2007: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 04 March 2010 | 32 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE CITY OF ODESSA, UKRAINE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THEIR GOOD HEALTH IN ANY MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
ODESSA, UKRAINE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window