Financial history TRANSFORM WORK

Charity Number: 1120053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £43.29k £26.12k £31.36k £37.53k £47.44k
Total expenditure £46.51k £25.36k £30.20k £36.30k £45.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A