LEWIS-MANNING HOSPICE CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lewis-Manning Hospice offers palliative care for local people living with cancer and some other life threatening illnesses. The services offered by the hospice are day hospice, lymphoedema clinic and breathlessness clinic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,428,729
Donations and legacies | £1.76m | |
Charitable activities | £462.96k | |
Other trading activities | £1.15m | |
Investments | £53.68k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,260,060
Raising funds | £188.82k | |
Charitable activities | £2.14m | |
Other | £935.31k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £462,960 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.12m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.14m | |
Retained for future use | £168.67k |
People

67 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
178 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
Governance
- 23 July 2007: Standard registration
- LEWIS-MANNING HOSPICE (Working name)
- THE LEWIS-MANNING TRUST (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kate Smeaton | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lewis William Barr | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Elizabeth Mary Baron | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mark Goodson | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Starmer | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev JANE ELLEN BURGESS | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander McDonald | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Lune | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Palmer | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN MARSHALL OBE | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Timothy Lee | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY ALLIN | Trustee | 06 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50m | £2.68m | £2.10m | £2.57m | £3.43m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63m | £2.23m | £2.05m | £2.81m | £3.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £300.16k | £472.48k | £451.04k | £695.62k | £462.96k | |
|
Income from government grants | £300.16k | £242.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £656.22k | £1.55m | £1.01m | £1.11m | £1.76m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £551.13k | £407.44k | £634.25k | £0 | £1.15m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £300.16k | £714.58k | £451.04k | £695.62k | £462.96k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.61k | £4.06k | £6.00k | £739.65k | £53.68k | |
|
Income - Other | £991.70k | £0 | £0 | £16.70k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £87.88k | £390.25k | £413.25k | £363.11k | £812.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.06m | £1.73m | £1.51m | £2.02m | £2.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £210.26k | £140.60k | £108.44k | £138.21k | £188.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £17.65k | £14.60k | £11.45k | £14.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £364.50k | £362.77k | £430.23k | £655.25k | £935.31k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.24m | £909.26k | £902.71k | £994.63k | £1.39m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £6 | £6 | £6 | £6 | |
|
Other assets | £1.93m | £2.80m | £2.85m | £2.54m | £2.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £158.03k | £243.07k | £240.20k | £263.08k | £677.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13 JUNE 2007 as amended on 29 May 2020 as amended on 07 Apr 2022 as amended on 14 Apr 2022 as amended on 05 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are for the public benefit and specifically restricted as follows: TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT in particular, but not exclusively, by: 1 establishing, maintaining and conducting a respite care centre and hospice to be known as Lewis-Manning Hospice Care; 2 establishing, maintaining and conducting other hospitals, residential nursing homes and clinics in England or Wales for the reception and care of persons who are suffering from any illness, disability, disease or other infirmity whether physical or mental and by providing medical or other treatment and attention for any such persons as aforesaid; 3 promoting or assisting in the education, teaching, or training of healthcare professionals; 4 conducting or promoting research into the care and treatment of persons suffering from any illness, disability, disease or infirmity and particularly into the care and treatment of persons suffering from cancer or terminal illnesses and to disseminate the results thereof to the public; 5 promoting or assisting in the provision of spiritual help and guidance to improve the wellbeing and quality of life of any persons resident (whether as day patients or otherwise) or working in any such centre, hospice, hospital or home as aforesaid.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lewis-Manning Hospice Care
56 Longfleet Road
POOLE
BH15 2JD
- Phone:
- 01202708470
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window