Accounts and annual returns CHETTLE COURT RANGERS (YOUTH) FOOTBALL CLUB (CCRFC)

Charity Number: 1120661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 04 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 03 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 24 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 May 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required