Financial history CHETTLE COURT RANGERS (YOUTH) FOOTBALL CLUB (CCRFC)

Charity Number: 1120661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.57k £22.11k £37.24k £27.45k £31.47k
Total expenditure £22.43k £34.67k £34.83k £23.46k £27.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.83k £1.50k N/A N/A