Accounts and annual returns TAJ - E - HAQ LTD

Charity number: 1121408
Charity reporting is up to date (164 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 10 January 2025 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 05 March 2024 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required