GARW VALLEY TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Subsidised tennis for local community and Bridgend area including adults, children, disadvantaged and disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
Governance
- 07 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GLYN WALTERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN JAMES BRITTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WYN PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2019 | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 02/09/2022 | 02/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.87k | £5.65k | £5.05k | £3.56k | £3.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.11k | £2.24k | £6.98k | £2.41k | £3.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 September 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 September 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2019 | 05 August 2020 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 15 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY INHABITANT OF THE GARW VALLEY AND LOCAL AREA IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES AND FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS
Area of benefit
GARW VALLEY AND LOCAL AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 ST. DAVID STREET
PONTYCYMER
BRIDGEND
CF32 8LT
- Phone:
- 01656870955
- Email:
- davidglyn33@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window