CALVARY INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES IN UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CALVARY INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES MAIN OBJECTIVE IS TO PREACH THE WORD OF GOD TO ALL MANKIND. THIS MEANS WE PREACH TO ALL NATIONS AND RACES.WE ALSO TEACH YOUNG CHILDREN OF DIFFERENT AGES ON HOW TO LIVE CHRISTIAN LIFE. WE ALSO ENGAGE IN CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE LOCAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES. WE ALSO BUILD CHURCHES, HOUSES AND BIBLE SCHOOLS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derby City
- Gloucestershire
- Manchester City
- Norfolk
- Botswana
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 01 November 2007: Standard registration
- CALVARY INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES IN UNITED KINGDOM / CALVARY INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES OF UNITED KINGDOM (Previous name)
- CALVARY INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND WELLINGTON ALEX MAKAVIRE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emmanuel Hondora | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.46k | £17.71k | £19.09k | £30.98k | £12.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.43k | £27.10k | £15.29k | £19.02k | £16.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 05/09/2015
Charitable objects
OBJECTIVES 1. ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH CHURCH SERVICES, CELL GROUPS, BIBLE SCHOOLS AND CHURCH PLANTATION. 2. RELIEF OF HARDSHIPS THROUGH FINANCIAL AND MATERIAL AID WITHIN THE NATION AND INTERNATIONALLY AS AND WHEN WE CAN. 3. SUPPORTING OF CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AD AFFILIATES WITH THE SAME OBJECTIVES AS OUR CHURCH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Area of benefit
NATIONALLY AND INTERNATONALLY. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE, BUT BASED IN NORWICH, NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Langholme
72 Hatherley Road
CHELTENHAM
GL51 6EQ
- Phone:
- 07708079543
- Email:
- makavire@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window