Trustees HOME-START WANDSWORTH LIMITED
Charity number: 1124109

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryony Susan Rustad | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Ann Tynan | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tutu Kamara | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Bowman | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Jill Salt | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Twitchin | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Selim Yuksel | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Jane Harris | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Helen Blenkinsop | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Leung | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Fergusson | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Holly Stilgoe | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.