UNITED INSTITUTIONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of Religious Education and Charitable Organisations in Israel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
- Israel
Governance
- 29 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ovadya Toporowitch | Trustee | 02 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ronnie Masar | Trustee | 02 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL EVAN FUERST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £901.74k | £226.57k | £404.54k | £550.09k | £383.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £446.38k | £354.86k | £399.97k | £675.19k | £455.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £36.75k | N/A | N/A | £36.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £23.87k | N/A | N/A | £17.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £841.12k | N/A | N/A | £495.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £143.72k | N/A | N/A | £141.28k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £302.66k | N/A | N/A | £533.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | £4.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £116.44k | N/A | N/A | £116.84k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £302.66k | N/A | N/A | £533.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT AND FUTHERANCE OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION AND JEWISH EDUCATION AND THE ALLEVIATION OF POVERTY AMONG THE JEWISH COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. 2 THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 DELLCOT CLOSE
PRESTWICH
MANCHESTER
M25 0GX
- Phone:
- 01617720632
- Email:
- michael@prtcorp.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window