FRIENDS OF EPINAY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils by developing effective relationships between the staff, parents, and others associated with the school. To engage in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support he school and advance the education of pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 07 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE MCGLEN | Chair | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Emma Price | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Rue | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Arnold | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY HUNTLEY | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEREK HUNTLEY | Trustee | 13 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANNE MOUNTAIN | Trustee | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH DUNN | Trustee | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £257 | £7.33k | £8.30k | £16.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13k | £189 | £2.12k | £1.48k | £1.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, TYNE & WEAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
Epinay Business and Enterprise School
Nevinson Avenue
South Shields
Tyne and Wear
NE34 8BT
- Phone:
- 0191 4898949
- Email:
- dmountain@epinay.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window