PUNJABI COMMUNITY CENTRE SWINDON

Charity Number: 1120285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Buildings, Facilities and open space

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £97,000
Total expenditure: £115,995

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Swindon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AJIT SINGH MUDHAR Chair
None on record
Sundip Singh Muddhar Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Jaswant Singh Duhra Trustee 21 January 2022
None on record
Manmohan Singh Nandhra Trustee 21 January 2022
None on record
Amarjit Singh Badwal Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Kulvinder Singh Sandhu Trustee 26 September 2012
None on record
MOHINDER SINGH RHENSI Trustee
None on record
ARUN BEDI Trustee
None on record
Dr HARBANS SINGH POPLI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.20k £1.30k £51.55k £82.40k £97.00k
Total expenditure £31.83k £12.38k £14.68k £50.86k £116.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 JOHN HERRING CRESCENT
SWINDON
SN3 4JJ
Phone:
07792391528
Email:
No information available
Website:

pccswindon.com