Accounts and annual returns SHRI DURGA BHAWAN TEMPLE INTERNATIONAL LTD

Charity Number: 1122783
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 25 February 2025 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 25 February 2025 87 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 25 February 2025 453 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 25 February 2025 453 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 25 February 2025 818 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 17 January 2023 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 25 February 2025 1183 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 20 March 2023 475 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1635 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1635 days