TWINKLE HOUSE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sensory-based support for children, young people and adults with any form of disability or additional learning need or sensory impairmant. Supporting improvements with their social, mental and emotional, behavioural and educational development and overall well-being, and support to their parents and carers. Providing sensory facilities for support, leisure and recreation for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £70,402 from 2 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 October 2007: Standard registration
- 30 April 2019: Funds received from 1110389 BRIGHTER FUTURE WORKSHOP LIMITED
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Davina Hanlon | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janine Ross | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Jowett | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tina Giannasi | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.75k | £240.51k | £218.00k | £310.64k | £373.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.88k | £208.83k | £232.40k | £264.01k | £335.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £69.98k | £70.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.90k | £13.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WEST LANCASHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS ('THE PROJECT AREA') TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF ANY PHYSICAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT OR LEARNING DISABILITY OR ILLNESS* ('THE PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES') IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
WEST LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Gorsey Place
East Gillibrands
SKELMERSDALE
LANCASHIRE
WN8 9UP
- Phone:
- 01695455625
- Email:
- enquiries@twinklehouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window