Financial history THE GOLDMAN SACHS CHARITABLE GIFT FUND (UK)

Charity number: 1120148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.21m £7.59m £1.72m £1.39m £1.37m
Total expenditure £2.08m £2.48m £3.24m £3.45m £3.76m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.09m £7.53m £1.62m £1.04m £995.31k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £119.98k £57.34k £102.63k £357.51k £374.58k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.02m £2.42m £3.17m £3.38m £3.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £57.58k £61.74k £65.43k £67.59k £64.73k
Expenditure - Governance £123.60k £119.40k £120.90k £141.18k £154.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.79m £2.19m £2.94m £3.14m £3.45m
Expenditure - Investment management £57.58k £61.74k £65.43k £67.59k £64.73k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0