TSUNAMI SUPPORT (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief and assistance of people affected by the Tsunami by providing a point of contact in the UK to offer support, practical advice and help in obtaining financial assistance. To co-operate with any statutory authority in the provision of a memorial to commemorate the tsunami victims, all those affected and to educate future generations about the human and environmental impact of this event.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 December 2007: Standard registration
- 18 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.01k | £510.01k | £4.95k | £1.74k | £380 | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.62k | £541.38k | £26.19k | £4.76k | £7.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £510.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £6 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £539.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 18 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 06 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 04 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY THE TSUNAMI BY PROVIDING A POINT OF CONTACT IN THE UK TO OFFER SUPPORT AND INFORMATION AND THROUGH WHICH PEOPLE CAN CONTACT EACH OTHER TO PROVIDE MUTUAL SUPPORT. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF UK CITIZENS AND RESIDENTS AFFECTED BY THE TSUNAMI BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, PRACTICAL ADVICE, AND HELP IN OBTAINING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window