YEOVIL SHOPMOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yeovil ShopMobility is a scheme providing powered and manual equipment to enable people with mobility impairment to shop and get out and about. Anyone with limited mobility can use ShopMobility whether through permanent or temporary disability, illness, accident or age. This equipment is available for daily or long term hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 11 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH ANDREWS | Chair | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Miell | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Meadon | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WHITE | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH HANN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.67k | £6.91k | £20.61k | £18.78k | £20.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.18k | £6.51k | £20.86k | £22.58k | £22.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.53k | N/A | £6.95k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 February 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED 20 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE ELDERLY, POOR, DISABLED OR LACK ADEQUATE AND SAFE PASSENGER SERVICES BY PROVIDING SHOPMOBILITY SERVICES AND OTHER ALLIED SERVICES IN YEOVIL AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR MOBILITY AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. YEOVIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yeovil ShopMobility
Quedam Shopping Centre
Quedam Carpark Basement Lift Lobby
Yeovil
Somerset
BA20 1EY
- Phone:
- 01935420889
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window