DAZZLING DREAMS GB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
relive poverty,sickness,advance education,promote health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ANTHONY ZABIELA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Katie WaIlding | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
SVEN KARL HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DORIS ZABIELA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.02k | £33.52k | £17.97k | £12.11k | £13.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.11k | £12.00k | £12.11k | £8.81k | £12.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 March 2025 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 June 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2023 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1073 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN OR THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM, TO 1 RELIEVE POVERTY; 2 ADVANCE EDUCATION; 3 RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE HEALTH; AND 4 PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
154
VAUGHTON
BIRMINGHAM
HIGH GATE
B12 0SS
- Phone:
- 07752448348
- Email:
- info@dazzlingdreamsgb.co.uk
- Website:
-
dazzlingdreamsgb.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window