TAMU DHEE ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Arranged a football tournament in Queens Avenue ground in Aldershot Army Garrison. Nepalese teams from other European countries also took part. 2. Arranged Nepali Mela (Nepalese culture, costume and ethnic traditional displays) at Kempton Park Race course. 3. Arranged Nepalese New Year (Lhochhar) celebration and religious puja at Aldershot, Hampshire. 4. Help provided to needy people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Kent
- Reading
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Nepal
Governance
- 03 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hari GURUNG | Trustee | 26 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Subasing Gurung BEM | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ekendra Gurung | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Hitkaji Gurung | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Surya Gurung | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SURJE GURUNG | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
DR C B GURUNG | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|||||
MAJOR DAMAR GHALE | Trustee | 27 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR KHUSIMAN GURUNG | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|||||
NANDA JANG GURUNG | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
GYAM BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee | 19 May 2011 |
|
|||||
MIN PRASAD GURUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAPT HITMAN GURUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JIT BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAJOR LAL BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAMAL GURUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAHESH GURUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUCHHETRA GURUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.53k | £60.83k | £145.45k | £127.16k | £214.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.57k | £41.16k | £130.29k | £106.22k | £174.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 February 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/06/2007 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2007
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2) TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF THE ELDERLY, SICK AND DISABLED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD CLOTHING AND HOUSING. 3) TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND HELP TO THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MANMADE DISASTERS. 4) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING WHICH IS WORK RELATED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
160-162 MYTCHETT ROAD
MYTCHETT
SURREY
GU16 6AE
- Phone:
- 07500268004
- Email:
- hari8004@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window