LIVERPOOL CARNIVAL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an arts charity and provide an annual "Samba Carnival" event in Liverpool. The event is now styled "Brazilica" and was run as an extended 4 day event in July 2011.It now has fringe events throughout July including film screenings in various locations. Artistes, musicians and performers travel locally, nationally and internationally to take part. community workshops take place weekly .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 03 March 2008: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 May 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID RICHARD BROUDIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOHN CHRISTOPHER DURANT WELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES BUCKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAEVE MARGARET MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.63k | £46.10k | £45.44k | £42.63k | £11.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.24k | £20.55k | £14.68k | £16.97k | £19.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.39k | £12.70k | £12.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 11 APRIL 2007 (AMENDED) 16 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ARTS (MEANING THE MUSICAL, VISUAL, LITERARY, DRAMATIC OR ANY OTHER ARTS PROVIDED IN EACH CASE THAT THEY ARE OF RECOGNISED CULTURAL, AESTHETIC OR EDUCATIONAL VALUE) AND TO FOSTER, PROMOTE AND INCREASE PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF AND TO IMPROVE PUBLIC TASTE AND INTEREST IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ORGANISING AND STAGING OF A RIO STYLE CARNIVAL PARADE AND INVOLVING THE PUBLIC IN THE ORGANISATION AND STAGING OF ANY SUCH CARNIVAL PARADES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 GROVE PARK
LIVERPOOL
L8 0TL
- Phone:
- 01517341110
- Email:
- Carnivalcompany@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window