Financial history HOMELAND EDUCATIONAL TRIPS

Charity Number: 1121694
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £9.30k £210 £2.50k £0 £2.50k
Total expenditure £390 £0 £2.50k £0 £2.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A