SPARKPLUG MOTORCYCLE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sparkplug provides services and activities for young people aged 8 - 18 years old. these include OCN accredited mechanic courses Level 1 & 2, off road scrambling trips, advice & guidance, family support, career's information, Youth Clubs, Dr Bike Project, AQA Unit Award Scheme in pedal bikes and motorbikes and NEET Projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- Hackney
- Islington
- Lambeth
Governance
- 14 August 2007: Standard registration
- 19 October 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.58k | £153.01k | £115.23k | £122.06k | £110.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.83k | £132.54k | £108.96k | £112.53k | £121.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 13 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 12 November 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS IN THE MAINTENANCE AND RIDING OF MOTORCYCLES; B) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS IN THE MAINTENANCE AND RIDING OF MOTORCYCLES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY REACH FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window