Financial history GLOUCESTERSHIRE BREASTFEEDING SUPPORTERS' NETWORK

Charity Number: 1121337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £29.01k £39.99k £18.86k £11.17k £33.53k
Total expenditure £24.02k £23.69k £37.38k £20.87k £21.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £3.91k £200 N/A N/A