Financial history CHAMOS - IN AID OF THE CHILDREN OF VENEZUELA

Charity number: 1123410
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £77.12k £79.88k £130.82k £160.57k £197.28k
Total expenditure £99.66k £74.79k £66.82k £156.26k £196.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A