Financial history IMPERIAL MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity Number: 1120047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.29k £14.41k £2.67k £12.56k £14.35k
Total expenditure £15.97k £6.69k £5.24k £14.50k £15.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A