Financial history HOPE IN SRI LANKA

Charity number: 1121160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £14.84k £6.11k £9.09k £10.14k £9.06k
Total expenditure £19.75k £2.36k £5.12k £34.83k £25.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A