SHEPHERD FOOD MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SFM relieves chronic hunger by running: Sustainable and eco-friendly farming and preservation methods to reduce post-harvest loss among small scale farmers and reduce malnutrition among children. Health clinics offering health check and advice; and Centre for capacity building offering career counselling and loan advice to beneficiaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
- Nigeria
Governance
- 21 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Ward | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Olusola John Omikunle | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anastasia Oyebanji | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor OLATUNJI ISOLA OGUNYEMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLUBUNMI FOLASHADE OGUNYEMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.94k | £9.03k | £5.10k | £8.86k | £8.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.68k | £0 | £15.50k | £7.02k | £8.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL TRUST DEED DATED 8 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF FOOD POVERTY BY ACQUIRING ACRES OF LAND TO GROW THE FOOD TO DONATE TO BENEFICIARIES THAT IS, CHILDREN, ORPHANS, WIDOWS, ELDERLY, SINGLE PARENTS, WITHIN ORPHANAGES AND MULTI-FAITH RELIGIOUS ORGANISATIONS IN NIGERIA. RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY SETTING UP A POOL OF MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND RUNNING A FREE OUTSIDE CLINIC FOR IT'S BENEFICIARIES IN HILEMA. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY ESTABLISHING AN EDUCATION GARDEN WITH RENEWABLE ENERGY LAB TO EDUCATE BENEFICIARIES ABOUT CONSIDERATION AND ECO-FRIENDLY AGRICULTURAL PRACTICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
311 PERSHORE WAY
LINCOLN
LN6 0FS
- Phone:
- 01522705532
- Email:
- admin@shepherdsfood.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window