Financial history CFYDC (CHANCE)

Charity Number: 1121341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £340.59k £364.89k £205.12k £340.81k £442.84k
Total expenditure £251.73k £357.96k £358.40k £273.46k £464.47k
Income from government contracts N/A £71.68k N/A N/A £20.81k
Income from government grants £126.69k £114.45k £41.23k £77.07k £110.54k