THE DRONFIELD HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRESERVING HISTORIC AND MAKING AVAILABLE BUILDINGS FOR COMMUNITY USE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 17 September 2007: Standard registration
- PEEL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN ANDREW POWELL | Chair | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Louise Anne Catherine Third MBE | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
WALTER CAMPBELL | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Emmens | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian George Simpson | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Ann Brown | Trustee | 02 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
DENISE SMILLIE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.10k | £190.22k | £237.43k | £237.43k | £232.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.73k | £164.82k | £153.60k | £153.60k | £296.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.68k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 December 2024 | 414 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 December 2024 | 414 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 July 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 July 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/04/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF NORTH DERBYSHIRE AND OF THE NATION, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND NORTH DERBYSHIRE IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING AS SON DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST; AND/OR 2) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF NORTH DERBYSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
NORTH DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dronfield Hall Barn
High Street
DRONFIELD
S18 1PX
- Phone:
- 01246418122
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window