Accounts and annual returns LITTLE STARS- LUXOR CHILDRENS TRUST

Charity number: 1120536
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 May 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 28 May 2023 26 August 2024 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2022 24 August 2024 515 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2020 16 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2020 Not Required