Financial history LITTLE RAINBOWS AUTISM GROUP

Charity number: 1121130
Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.12k £6.11k £2.50k £2.50k £2.50k
Total expenditure £11.37k £14.44k £0 £0 £900
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A