SHENLEY FIELDS PRESCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education and care of children aged 0 - 11 years in the Bartley Green area of South West Birmingham. The charity is open 51 weeks per year and 5 days per week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2018
Total income includes £102,441 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 08 February 2008: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.70k | £243.24k | £289.60k | £306.44k | £227.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.58k | £252.66k | £275.74k | £298.40k | £244.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £113.69k | £0 | £123.97k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £102.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 02 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | 02 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 11 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | 11 October 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/02/2014
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE BARTLEY GREEN COMMUNITY UNDER THE STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE, PARTICULARLY THROUGH LEARNING AND CREATIVE PLAY AND BY ENCOURAGING THE INVOLVEMENT OF PARENTS AND/OR CARERS IN THE CHILD'S DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION 2 TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
BARTLEY GREEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window