ROTARY CLUB OF WINSLOW TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Trust fund is to support the efforts of Rotary International in the fulfilment of the objects of Rotary, Rotarys Mission and the achievement of world understanding and peace through local, national and international humanitarian, educational and cultural programmes. In addition the fund focuses on the specific needs of local charities, organisations and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 12 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter William Stanyer | Chair | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BERNARD BROWN | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ALEXANDER MCCALLION | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John KING | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.18k | £13.98k | £28.77k | £26.53k | £29.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.49k | £14.35k | £27.00k | £27.37k | £24.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5A Horn Street
Winslow
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 3AP
- Phone:
- 07976652928
- Email:
- peterstanyer@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window