STOURBRIDGE CHOIR AND ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1124608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of musical arts to local children and adults

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £7,268
Total expenditure: £7,364

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley
  • Staffordshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STOURBRIDGE CHORAL AND ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Beasley Chair 14 November 2024
None on record
Jane Dimmick Trustee 20 November 2024
None on record
Janice Margaret Coggan Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
Angela Hopkins Trustee 21 March 2018
None on record
DR MOLLIE BERRY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.51k £300 £2.84k £9.29k £7.27k
Total expenditure £6.58k £1.50k £3.71k £9.33k £7.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 13 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 22 June 2024 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 PARGETER STREET
STOURBRIDGE
DY8 1AU
Phone:
01384373111