Financial history WIGAN ATHLETIC FC COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1120745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.18m £1.36m £1.68m £1.60m £1.65m
Total expenditure £1.25m £1.26m £1.67m £1.73m £1.67m
Income from government contracts £22.14k N/A N/A N/A £93.78k
Income from government grants £244.31k £247.53k £12.00k £120.53k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £13.48k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.17m £1.35m £1.68m £1.60m £1.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.17k £242 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.26m £1.67m £1.73m £1.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £6.78k £6.75k £6.10k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0