Accounts and annual returns NEW ORIEL HALL

Charity Number: 1120867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 June 2024 946 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 June 2024 946 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window