Kingdom Within Fellowship London

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have various discipleship programs, bible study groups and outreach ministries- all have the purpose of building up and strengthening the body of Christ, presenting the church as an unblemished bride, for the coming of our Lord Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 July 2007: Standard registration
- POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP UK WOOLWICH CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ESEGINE | Chair | 12 May 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.74k | £8.70k | £4.84k | £2.41k | £407 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.61k | £7.61k | £3.80k | £2.12k | £268 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 2007 as amended on 06 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN WOOLWICH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY REGARDLESS OF NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION IN WOOLWICH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WOOLWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Acacia Way
SIDCUP
Kent
DA15 8WW
- Phone:
- 07775762324
- Email:
- church180woolwich@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window