WENSUM VALLEY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conserving and enhancing the countryside of the Wensum Valley. Facilitating the quiet enjoyment of the area for local people and visitors. Promoting understanding of the area and the need for its conservation amongst local residents. Seeking to ensure that activities and development are appropriately carefully assessed and implemented. Facilitating co-ordinated partnership working.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 10 August 2007: Standard registration
- 08 June 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.95k | £35.38k | £70.23k | £18.93k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.31k | £40.62k | £37.53k | £34.42k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 12 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION, DATED 26 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window