Financial history THE FRIEND'S OF ST PETER'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL - COGGESHALL

Charity Number: 1120399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £20.67k £16.97k £28.95k £40.89k £33.83k
Total expenditure £19.13k £20.13k £18.83k £37.21k £46.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £839 N/A N/A