THE FRIEND'S OF ST PETER'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL - COGGESHALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We arrange regular meetings with committee members, the school head/deputy are often present. We hold regular fundraising events to raise money for the school. We liase with the school regularly and promote ourselves through the school newsletter. We support school arranged events like sports days, plays and provide refreshments. We build a good rapport with teachers, parents and pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 01 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerrie Brinkley-Whittington | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Glegg | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Bennett | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Astley | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Reed | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Closs | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Thompson | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fran Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Cowan | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gwenneth Whitby | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Summers | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Newby | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Storey | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Curtis | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Calvert | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Appleton-Claydon | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Dey | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Gabara | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Tanfield | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.59k | £20.67k | £16.97k | £28.95k | £40.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.57k | £19.13k | £20.13k | £18.83k | £37.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £839 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PETERS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
MYNEER PARK
COGGESHALL
COLCHESTER
CO6 1YU
- Phone:
- 01376561328
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window