CROWN FINANCIAL MINISTRIES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crown Financial Ministries has developed and distributed study resources designed to help people learn and apply biblical financial principles and has passed its activities onto Christian Financial Compass Trust, a charity with similar objects, as from 31 March 2014
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 February 2008: Standard registration
- 18 November 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 18 November 2014: Funds transferred to 1154512 YOUR MONEY COUNTS
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.34k | £85.34k | £43.96k | £10.47k | £4.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.41k | £76.57k | £73.57k | £28.60k | £14.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 20 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 25 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 25 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 25 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 30 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 22 November 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED (DATED) 12 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THIS TRUST SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF FINANCIAL EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS SO AS TO REDUCE THE LIKELIHOOD OF INDEBTEDNESS OR INSOLVENCY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND STUDY MATERIALS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window