OPEN HANDS TRUST (LEICESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering practical help to those in need in Leicester & beyond. This help currently includes food, clothing, household items & personal support & training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£620,310
Donations and legacies | £376.48k | |
Charitable activities | £243.20k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £623 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£631,347
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £631.35k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £156,458 from 1 government contract(s) and £19,160 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £631.35k |
People

17 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 22 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DAVID HIND | Chair |
|
||||||
James Mark Saker | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Christina Ellen Gardiner | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Jewitt | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HENRY BENNETT | Trustee | 27 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Hind | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.44k | £496.53k | £597.95k | £421.79k | £620.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £329.12k | £341.31k | £414.89k | £440.16k | £631.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £91.45k | £185.07k | £163.32k | £175.03k | £156.46k | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.64k | N/A | N/A | £34.50k | £19.16k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £403.39k | N/A | £376.48k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £194.48k | N/A | £243.20k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £82 | N/A | £623 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £388.26k | N/A | £631.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.40k | N/A | £2.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £26.64k | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £345.22k | N/A | £302.57k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £133.68k | N/A | £100.25k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £64.57k | N/A | £17.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD: 1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND RESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PLACES AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE COMMUNITY AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY AND NURSERY ACTIVITIES; 2.2 FACILITIES FOR DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF SCHOOL AGE DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS; 2.3 THE TRAINING OF PARENTS AND OTHER PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF CHILD CARE AND PARENTING SKILLS; 2.4 THE ENABLING OF DISABLED AND DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE TO IMPROVE THEIR LIFESTYLES BY PROVIDING EFFECTIVE TRAINING IN INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND OTHER RELEVANT OFFICE SKILLS; IN PARTICULAR TO ENHANCE THE PROSPECTS FOR SUCH TRAINED PEOPLE TO OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT BY ACTING AS A BRIDGE TO LINK THEM WITH EMPLOYERS AND INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER LEARNING WHETHER WORK ACTIVITIES ARE CONDUCTED IN A WORKPLACE, PLACE OF LEARNING OR AT HOME; 2.5 RELIEF FROM AND SUPPORT TO PERSONS OF ALL AGES AFFECTED BY, PREGNANCY, DRUG ABUSE, ALCOHOL ABUSE, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS, DEPRIVATION, DESTITUTION AND HELPLESSNESS; 2.6 THE TEACHING OF LIFE SKILLS TO CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS SO AS TO BETTER ENABLE THEM TO COPE WITH THE BUSINESS OF LIFE; 2.7 TRAINING AND EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OVER SCHOOL LEAVING AGE; AND 2.8 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, PROPERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITY
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Lower Willow Street
LEICESTER
LE1 2HP
- Phone:
- 01163261857
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window