TEAMIPSWICH SWIMMING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teamipswich Swimming (TIS) supports over 500 swimmers through a swim academy, competitive squads, disability swimming and water polo. Young children and adults, able-bodied or disabled, may benefit from our services promoting life saving, health/fitness, and competition in the Ipswich community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 January 2008: Standard registration
- 04 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1156933 TEAMIPSWICH SWIMMING
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.29k | £134.97k | £122.54k | £198.66k | £222.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.36k | £107.87k | £112.66k | £206.98k | £210.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 22 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 22 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 21 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 21 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 17 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 17 June 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: 1. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN A HEALTHY RECREATION TO RESIDENTS OF IPSWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING SWIMMING OPPORTUNITIES, FROM LEARN TO SWIM SKILLS TO COMPETITIVE SWIMMING, WATER POLO AND DISABILITY SWIMMING IN A COST EFFECTIVE METHOD AFFORDABLE FOR ALL FAMILIES. 2. THE PRESERVATION OF HUMAN LIFE BY THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF SWIMMING, WATER SAFETY, AND SURVIVAL IN THE WATER. 3. TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF ALL BACKGROUNDS AND ABILITIES THROUGH COMPETITIVE AND FITNESS ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP PERSONAL AND SOCIAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH INDIVIDUAL GOALS AND TEAM SPIRIT, CREATING MATURE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
IPSWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window